Kaethler, Yvonne Erica (CPSO#: 71467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winchester District Memorial Hosp.
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1910 St. Laurent Blvd
Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: 613-248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Kemptville District Hospital
PO Box 2007
2675 Consession Rd
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-6133
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yvonne Kaethler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kaethler ( CPSO# 71467 )

Business Address:
Winchester Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
Kemptville Hospital
2675 Consession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
29 - 1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVONNE ERICA KAETHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAETHLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2010 to 06 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999