Kagal, Allan Dan (CPSO#: 71643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7
2200 Rutherford Road
Maple ON  L4K 5V2
Phone: (416) 849-2250
Fax: (416) 849-2252
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Kagal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kagal ( CPSO# 71643 )

Business Address:
2200 Rutherford Road
Suite 7
Vaughan ON  L4K 5V2
Phone Number: (905) 849-2250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN DAN KAGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001