Kagal, Darren Ronen (CPSO#: 83250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 407
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 398-2220
Fax: (416) 398-2221
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.R. Kagal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kagal ( CPSO# 83250 )

Business Address:
407 - 4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 398-2220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN RONEN KAGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008