Kahlon, Roopjeet (CPSO#: 95033)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Surrey Memorial Hospital 13750 96 Avenue Surrey BC V3V 1Z2
Date Received: 27 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2011 to 17 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 26 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015