Kajal, Babita (CPSO#: 93838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jospeh Brant Hospital
Dept of Pathology & Laboratory
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 681-4826
Fax: (905) 336-6483
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 13 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BABITA KAJAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAJAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016