Kajbaf, Sahar (CPSO#: 72478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 100
3 Conestoga Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone: (905) 497-0114
Fax: (905) 497-7114
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

WOHC- Brampton Site
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3S7
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

WOHC- Etobicoke Site
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kajbaf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kajbaf ( CPSO# 72478 )

Business Address:
WOHC - Brampton Site
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
WOHC Etobicoke Site
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
100 - 3 Conestoga Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 497-0114

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 31 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAHAR KAJBAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAJBAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2002