Kakavand, Farid (CPSO#: 81830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi, Iranian, Kurdi

Education:Bangalore University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgina Family Medical Centre
Suite 201
417 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 2C7
Phone: (905) 989-7800
Fax: (905) 535-7800
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10243 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B2
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-8755
Fax: (905) 237-8756
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

10243 Yonge street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B2
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-8755
Fax: (905) 237-8756
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Kakavand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kakavand ( CPSO# 81830 )

Business Address:
Richmond Hill Medical Clinic
10243 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B2
Phone Number: (905) 989-7800

Business Address:
201 - 417 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 2C7
Phone Number: (905) 989-7800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARID KAKAVAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAKAVAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2004 to 18 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2006