Kaki, Fatima Mohammed Ahmad (CPSO#: 92293)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Dec 2009 to 23 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011