Kakizawa, Karen Anny Toda (CPSO#: 76038)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:UNIVERSIDADE FEDERAL DO PARA, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 10 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Aug 2003 to 15 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2003