Kakzanov, Vered Vera (CPSO#: 89253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Kakzanov, Vered (used until: 28 Jun 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yorkgate Mall
Suite 136 A
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone: (416) 745-4555
Fax: (416) 745-0786
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave. KGE-31
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Kakzanov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kakzanov ( CPSO# 89253 )

Business Address:
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Suite 136A
Box 105
Toronto ON  M3N 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 745-4555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VERED VERA KAKZANOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAKZANOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010