Kalantari, Saeed (CPSO#: 86026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Apr 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 730-1300
Fax: (416) 730-0600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kalantari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kalantari ( CPSO# 86026 )

Business Address:
Suite 212
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 730-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Saeed  Kalantari  may  practise medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.