Kale, Karna Chandarrao (CPSO#: 82562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marketplace Medical
Unit C7
4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3M1
Phone: (905) 507-4300
Fax: (905) 507-4308
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karna Kale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kale ( CPSO# 82562 )

Business Address:
Marketplace Medical
C7 - 4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3M1
Phone Number: (905) 507-4700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARNA CHANDARRAO KALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007