Kale, Rajendra Dhundiraj (CPSO#: 90060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Dec 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 17932
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 04 Dec 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Rajendra  Dhundiraj  Kale  may  practise  medicine  independently in
                  neurology, only.