Kale, Shoan Chandarrao (CPSO#: 97793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4555 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3M1
Phone: (905) 507-4300
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHOAN CHANDARRAO KALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2014