Kalia, Suneil Kumar (CPSO#: 84668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital WW-4-428
Division of Neurosurgery
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5866
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016


Corporation Name: Kalia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kalia ( CPSO# 84668 )
Dr. L. Kalia ( CPSO# 84739 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
WW-4-428
Division of Neurosurgery
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5866

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNEIL KUMAR KALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012