Kalina, Dale Robert (CPSO#: 108890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Masaryk University in Brno, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 - 25 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE ROBERT KALINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018