Kalisiak, Maria Teresa (CPSO#: 57628)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Kalisiak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kalisiak ( CPSO# 57628 )

Business Address:
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 534-4230

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr Andrew Bennett 505 - 27 Roncesvalles Ave Toronto, ON M6R 3B2
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact Dr Bennett at the address above.
Date Received: 05 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2018