Kalyvas, Maria (CPSO#: 73427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2630 Ext. 4509
Fax: (613) 548-1355
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: de Metz Mahmud Brundage Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Owen ( CPSO# 90402 )
Dr. A. Ashworth ( CPSO# 83277 )
Dr. S. Thain ( CPSO# 72665 )
Dr. C. Shenfield ( CPSO# 65985 )
Dr. W. Mackillop ( CPSO# 32028 )
Dr. A. Mahmud ( CPSO# 81278 )
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )
Dr. T. Hanna ( CPSO# 81017 )
Dr. C. Falkson ( CPSO# 76042 )
Dr. C. de Metz ( CPSO# 57842 )
Dr. M. Brundage ( CPSO# 52901 )
Dr. K. Zaza ( CPSO# 81879 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631


Corporation Name: Maria Kalyvas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kalyvas ( CPSO# 73427 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital & Cancer Centre of South
Department of Radiation Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2630

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 12 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA KALYVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALYVAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2007