Kam, April Jacqueline (CPSO#: 79077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept of Paediatric Emergency Med
Room HSC 2N49i
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73068
Fax: (905) 524-5707
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kam Miklea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Miklea ( CPSO# 74036 )
Dr. A. Kam ( CPSO# 79077 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
McMaster Family Practice Unit
3rd Floor
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Business Address:
HHS-McMaster Childrens Hospital
Department of Paediatric Emergency Medicine
Room HSC 2N49
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. APRIL JACQUELINE KAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2007