Kam, Michael Simon (CPSO#: 72667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener ON  N2K 1M3
Phone: (519) 896-6699
Fax: (519) 279-1585
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

280 Lester street
Waterloo ON  N2J 4G8
Canada
Phone: 519-896-6699
Fax: 519-279-1585
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Simon Kam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 7 2007


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Simon Kam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kam ( CPSO# 72667 )

Business Address:
280 Lester Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 3W5
Phone Number: (519) 896-6699

Business Address:
580 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener ON  N2K 1M3
Phone Number: (866) 354-8380

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SIMON KAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000