Kamal, Fadi Abdullah Bakr (CPSO#: 80585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone: (519) 533-6964
Fax: (519) 533-6965
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fadi Kamal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kamal ( CPSO# 80585 )

Business Address:
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A1
Phone Number: (519) 533-6964

Business Address:
333 Athlone Avenue
Suite 105
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 533-6964

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 07 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FADI ABDULLAH BAKR KAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2004 to 15 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012