Kamatovic, Ralph John (CPSO#: 79557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone: (905) 871-1220
Fax: (905) 871-1221
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

209 Glenridge Ave
St Catharines ON  L2T 3J6
Canada
Phone: (289) 362-5333
Fax: (289) 362-5335
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

7481 Oakwood dr.
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6S5
Canada
Phone: (289) 477-6011
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ralph Kamatovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kamatovic ( CPSO# 79557 )

Business Address:
7 - 238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-1220

Business Address:
5 - 209 Glenridge
St Catharines ON  L2T 3J6
Phone Number: (289) 362-5333

Business Address:
7481 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6S5
Phone Number: (289) 477-6011

Business Address:
6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone Number: (905) 374-3344

Business Address:
230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647


Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RALPH JOHN KAMATOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMATOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005