Kamawi, Malalai (CPSO#: 81380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Ahmadzai, Malalai (used until: 02 Jun 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
65 Braydon Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2S4
Phone: (905) 794-7649
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malalai Kamawi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kamawi ( CPSO# 81380 )

Business Address:
Castlemore Health Centre
Suite 3
65 Braydon Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6P 2S4
Phone Number: (905) 794-7649

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALALAI KAMAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 13 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008