Kamel, Sahar Safwat Fahim (CPSO#: 63136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAHAR SAFWAT FAHIM KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 17 Sep 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1997

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Kamel’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Kamel engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician in her use of social media including in approximately 2016 to 2018. It is also alleged that Dr. Kamel engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in boundary violations including by employing a patient; making inappropriate, unprofessional and/or racist comments; terminating her physician patient relationship with one of the patients and/or by failing, on multiple occasions, to keep medical records for appointments with one of the patients and including medical records for one of the patients in the other patient’s file.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)