Kamens, Cathy Ann (CPSO#: 84159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Connecticut, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2N1
Phone: (416) 470-6690
Fax: (416) 470-6691
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHY ANN KAMENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMENS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012