Kamminga, Amanda Maria (CPSO#: 89073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverview Medical Group
Department of Family Medicine
Lower Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone: (519) 787-1200
Fax: (519) 787-1803
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union St. East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda Kamminga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kamminga ( CPSO# 89073 )

Business Address:
Riverview Medical Group
Department of Family Medicine
Lower Level
205 Queen Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1T2
Phone Number: (519) 787-1200

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-2940

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA MARIA KAMMINGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMMINGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010