Kanani, Kunal Purushottam (CPSO#: 71325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kunal P. Kanani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kanani ( CPSO# 71325 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUNAL PURUSHOTTAM KANANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002