Kanaroglou, Androniki (CPSO#: 84444)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2015