Kanchanaranya, Navapol (CPSO#: 85541)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mahidol University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2006 to 16 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008