Kandasamy, Balakowsala (CPSO#: 93870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Rd East
Suite 105
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 2397663
Fax: (905) 2394664
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2867 Ellesmere rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2867 Ellesmere rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balakowsala Kandasamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kandasamy ( CPSO# 93870 )

Business Address:
300 Rossland Road East
Suite 105
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 239-7663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BALAKOWSALA KANDASAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDASAMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014