Kandasamy, Gengatharan (CPSO#: 90282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 9
1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone: (905) 426-5050
Fax: (905) 426-5077
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

78 - 20 New Delhi Dr
Markham ON  L3S 0B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 294-4489
Fax: (905) 294-4479
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gengatharan Kandasamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kandasamy ( CPSO# 90282 )

Business Address:
9 - 1801 Harwood Avenue North
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-5050

Business Address:
78-20 New Delhi Drive
Markham ON  L3S 0B5
Phone Number: (905) 294-4489

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Mar 2009 to 31 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jun 2009 to 08 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 09 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Gengatharan  Kandasamy  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
            medicine.