Kandasamy, Sritharani (CPSO#: 83150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Wall Street
Burlinton MA  01803
United States
Phone: 7812212940

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SRITHARANI KANDASAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDASAMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2008 to 05 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2013