Kandel, Christopher Edward (CPSO#: 95948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Kandel, Christopher (used until: 22 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3505
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabor Kandel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kandel ( CPSO# 50879 )
Dr. R. Kandel ( CPSO# 50880 )
Dr. C. Kandel ( CPSO# 95948 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 16-060
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3093

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EDWARD KANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015