Kane, Martin David (CPSO#: 77597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin D. Kane Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kane ( CPSO# 77597 )

Business Address:
421 Greenbrook Drive
Suite 23B
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3510

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN DAVID KANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2004