Kane, Sheri-Lynn Catherine (CPSO#: 63672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Main Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4021
Fax: (519) 685-4093
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheri-Lynn Kane Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kane ( CPSO# 63672 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Main Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4292

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERI-LYNN CATHERINE KANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1992