Kankaria, Pratibha (CPSO#: 86619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Rajasthan University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bolton Medical Centre
Suite 207
12295 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 1M2
Phone: (905) 857-8855
Fax: (905) 857-7249
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pratibha Kankaria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kankaria ( CPSO# 86619 )

Business Address:
Suite # 207
Bolton Medical Centre
12295 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 1M2
Phone Number: (905) 857-8855

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRATIBHA KANKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANKARIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009