Kao, Dina Hui-Jen (CPSO#: 73465)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 29 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2001 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2004