Kapoor, Monika (CPSO#: 81293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department Of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Rfe Gs 480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3946
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monika Kapoor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kapoor ( CPSO# 81293 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
RFE-GS-480 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3946

Business Address:
10 Lower Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone Number: (647) 827-9200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIKA KAPOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPOOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2006