Kapoor, Vikram (CPSO#: 91173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120 Ext. 57337
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1001 Peter Robertson Blvd
Brampton ON  L6R2Y3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vikram Kapoor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kapoor ( CPSO# 91173 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
1001 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 2Y3
Phone Number: (905) 791-2449

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKRAM KAPOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPOOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011