Kappos, Stamatina (CPSO#: 65611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C1
Phone: (705) 645-2223
Fax: (705) 645-2342
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-4404
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iannantuono and Kappos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kappos ( CPSO# 65611 )
Dr. B. Iannantuono ( CPSO# 65121 )

Business Address:
Archdekon Medical Group
Box 660
205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1T9
Phone Number: (705) 645-2223

Business Address:
9 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E2
Phone Number: (705) 646-1043

Business Address:
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 646-1043

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STAMATINA KAPPOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPPOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993