Kara, Mahmud (CPSO#: 59474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1989

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
1614 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y8
Phone: (905) 438-9000
Fax: (905) 438-9001
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

414 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-9122
Fax: (416) 284-2031
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Kara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kara ( CPSO# 59474 )

Business Address:
200 - 39 Pleasant Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4T 1K2
Phone Number: (800) 390-5611

Business Address:
101 - 1614 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 8Y8
Phone Number: (905) 438-9000

Business Address:
414 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 284-9122

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMUD KARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1989

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)