Karachiwalla, Fareen Iqbal (CPSO#: 95324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KFL&A Public Health
221 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 1V5
Phone: 613-549-1232 Ext. 1234
Fax: 613-549-7896
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

263 Weller Ave
Kingston ON  K7K 2V4
Canada
Phone: 613-542-2949
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAREEN IQBAL KARACHIWALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARACHIWALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013