Karani, Yasir (CPSO#: 94633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400 Ext. 32163
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3024 Hurontario Street, Suite 208
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Canada
Phone: (905) 566-1010
Fax: (905) 566-0440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasir Karani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Karani ( CPSO# 94633 )
Dr. S. Sharieff ( CPSO# 103231)

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6G 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 444-2120

Business Address:
Suite 208
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 566-1010

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASIR KARANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2013