Karanicolas, Paul Jack (CPSO#: 79008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room T 2016
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4774
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul J. Karanicolas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Karanicolas ( CPSO# 79008 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room T 2016
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JACK KARANICOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARANICOLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2011