Karanjia, Rustum Sarosh (CPSO#: 88911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 738-7100
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karanjia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Karanjia ( CPSO# 88911 )

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSTUM SAROSH KARANJIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARANJIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2016