Karavattathayyil, Sebastian Joseph (CPSO#: 77451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Michael Garron Hospital, TEHN
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 2985
Fax: (416) 469-6359
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN JOSEPH KARAVATTATHAYYIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARAVATTATHAYYIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 May 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2003