Karim, Sadia (CPSO#: 95238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Rd
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613)8431718
Fax: (613)8430201
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sadia Karim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karim ( CPSO# 95238 )

Business Address:
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SADIA KARIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2013