Karkanis, Sami John George (CPSO#: 69158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Mansoura University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 10 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., April 29, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sami
            John George Karkanis:


                  i.    Dr. Karkanis shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the
                        College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course and the
                        College's Understanding Boundaries and Preventing Boundary
                        Violations in the Doctor Patient Relationship Course on the next
                        available date, and to provide proof thereof to the College; [Note:
                        Dr. Karkanis has met this requirement.] 
                  
                  ii.   Dr. Karkanis may not have any in-person professional encounters
                        with female patients in his office practice, except in the presence
                        of a female chaperone (the "Practice Monitor"). In particular: 
                  
                        a.    The Practice Monitor shall be a member of a registered health
                              profession pursuant to the Regulated Health Professions Act,
                              1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended, who is approved by the
                              College and who has executed an undertaking with the College;
                  
                        b.    The Practice Monitor shall initial each patient chart for
                              which they are present and there will be a second written
                              record kept chronologically for each patient seen (the
                              "Log"). The Log shall be kept by Dr. Karkanis and initialed
                              by the Practice Monitor who was present during the encounter.
                              Dr. Karkanis shall ensure that contemporaneously with any
                              encounter or interaction with any female patient in his
                              office, the Practice Monitor initials the Log in addition to
                              the patient chart;
                  
                        c.    If the Practice Monitor has concerns that Dr. Karkanis'
                              practice exposes his patients to risk of harm or injury, the
                              Practice Monitor must agree to report this to the College
                              immediately.
                  
                        d.    Dr. Karkanis shall place a sign in his waiting room and each
                              of his examination rooms in his office that states that Dr.
                              Karkanis shall not see female patients without the presence
                              of another female registered health professional approved by
                              the College;
                  
                  iii.  With respect to Dr. Karkanis' hospital practice, Dr. Karkanis shall
                        not perform any pelvic, rectal or breast examination on any female
                        patient unless in the presence of a female regulated health
                        professional employed by the hospital (the "Hospital Monitor") who
                        observes all aspects of the examination. In addition:
                  
                        a.    Dr. Karkanis shall ensure the Hospital Monitor initials the
                              patient record indicating her presence and observation
                              throughout the examination; and,
                  
                        b.    Dr. Karkanis will ensure that the Chief of Staff in all
                              hospitals in which
                              Dr. Karkanis practices are aware of the restrictions on his
                              practice.
                  
                  iv.   Dr. Karkanis shall provide his irrevocable consent to the College
                        to make appropriate inquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        and/or any person or institution that may have relevant information
                        in order for the College to monitor compliance with the terms of
                        this Order. 

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Nov 2012
Summary:

On November 16, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sami John George Karkanis 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a 
patient; and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Karkanis contested the allegations.  
 
Dr. Karkanis specializes in obstetrics and gynaecology and has practised in Ajax and Pickering. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Karkanis made repeated inappropriate comments to his patient, 
Ms X, concerning the attractiveness of her abdominal skin while touching her abdomen in 2002 
and 2003, and that this conduct constitutes disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 
 
The Committee also found that Dr. Karkanis sexually abused Ms X during a pelvic examination 
in 2006, through inappropriately touching Ms X’s clitoris and repeatedly inserting his fingers in 
and out of Ms X’s vagina, and through making remarks of a sexual nature towards the patient. 
The Committee further determined that Dr. Karkanis’ conduct during this appointment 
constitutes conduct that is disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
On April 10, 2013, the Committee ordered and directed that: 

   1) the Registrar shall revoke Dr. Karkanis’ certificate of registration, to take effect on the 
      date of this order; 

   2) Dr. Karkanis shall appear before the Discipline Panel to be reprimanded on a date to be 
      fixed by the Hearings Office, which shall be no later than six months from the date this 
      Order becomes final; 

   3) Dr. Karkanis shall reimburse the College for any funding provided to the patient under 
      the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable letter 
      of credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such 
      amounts, in the amount of $18,520 by May 13, 2013; and 

   4) Dr. Karkanis shall pay to the College by May 13, 2013, costs of the hearing in the amount 
      of $14,600. 

On May 9, 2013, Dr. Karkanis appealed the finding and penalty decisions of the Discipline 
Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). In the circumstances, the decision 
of the Discipline Committee remains in effect despite the appeal. 
 
On December 4, 2014, the Divisional Court allowed Dr. Karkanis’ appeal and returned the 
matter for rehearing.  
 
On April 14, 2015, the allegations were withdrawn. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 04 Dec 2014
Hearing Date(s): September 10-12, , 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Jan 2010
Summary:

On January 27, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sami J. Karkanis committed an 
act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the 
practise of medicine that, having regard to all circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Karkanis did not follow the College's Physician-Patient Dating guidelines, which were in 
effect in 2004 and which outlined the general rule that a period of one year should pass between 
the last professional contact and commencement of a personal relationship.   In the circumstances 
of this case, the general rule should have been followed: there had been personal disclosures on 
the part of the complainant; Dr. Karkanis admitted that during the doctor-patient relationship 
feelings had developed; and Dr. Karkanis admitted to being infatuated. Dr. Karkanis knew that 
she was a vulnerable woman by her disclosures during the doctor-patient relationship.   Dr. 
Karkanis initiated a personal sexual relationship in circumstances where he ought to have waited 
the full one year period before initiating such a relationship.  
 
On April 29, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 
1.    Dr. Karkanis appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
2.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Karkanis' certificate of registration for a period of five (5) 
      months, to commence April 30, 2010.  
 
3.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Karkanis' 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      i.    Dr. Karkanis shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's 
            Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course and the College's Understanding 
            Boundaries and Preventing Boundary Violations in the Doctor-Patient 
            Relationship Course on the next available date, and to provide proof thereof to the 
            College; 
 
      ii.   Dr. Karkanis may not have any in-person professional encounters with female 
            patients in his office practice, except in the presence of a female chaperone (the 
            "Practice Monitor"). In particular:  
 
            a.    The Practice Monitor shall be a member of a registered health profession 
                  pursuant to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, 
                  as amended, who is approved by the College and who has executed an 
                  undertaking with the College; 
            b.    The Practice Monitor shall initial each patient chart for which they are 
                  present and there will be a second written record kept chronologically for 
                  each patient seen (the "Log"). The Log shall be kept by Dr. Karkanis and 
                  initialed by the Practice Monitor who was present during the encounter. 
                  Dr. Karkanis shall ensure that contemporaneously with any encounter or 
                  interaction with any female patient in his office, the Practice Monitor 
                  initials the Log in addition to the patient chart; 
 
 
            c.    If the Practice Monitor has concerns that Dr. Karkanis' practice exposes 
                  his patients to risk of harm or injury, the Practice Monitor must agree to 
                  report this to the College immediately. 
            d.    Dr. Karkanis shall place a sign in his waiting room and each of his 
                  examination rooms in his office that states that Dr. Karkanis shall not see 
                  female patients without the presence of another female registered health 
                  professional approved by the College; 
 
      iii.  With respect to Dr. Karkanis' hospital practice, Dr. Karkanis shall not perform any 
            pelvic, rectal or breast examination on any female patient unless in the presence of 
            a female regulated health professional employed by the hospital (the "Hospital 
            Monitor") who observes all aspects of the examination. In addition: 
 
            a.    Dr. Karkanis shall ensure the Hospital Monitor initials the patient record 
                  indicating her presence and observation throughout the examination; and, 
            b.    Dr. Karkanis will ensure that the Chief of Staff in all hospitals in which 
                  Dr. Karkanis practices are aware of the restrictions on his practice. 
 
      iv.   Dr. Karkanis shall provide his irrevocable consent to the College to make 
            appropriate inquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or 
            institution that may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor 
            compliance with the terms of this Order.  
 
      v.    Dr. Karkanis shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and 
            records and any other step as the College may require for the purposes of 
            monitoring and enforcing compliance with the terms of this Order. 
 
4.    Dr. Karkanis pay to the College costs in the amount of $10,000, within 60 days of the 
      date of this Order. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 04, 2009