Karlstedt, Erin Victoria (CPSO#: 107224)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5424
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2018 to 16 Nov 2018
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015