Karp, Natalya Sagitovna (CPSO#: 91853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Kazakh State Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8500 Ext. 74996
Fax: 519 685 8214
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natalya Karp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Karp ( CPSO# 91853 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
P.O. Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALYA SAGITOVNA KARP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jul 2009 to 05 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014